This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2019 at 07:32:50 (UTC).

ADAMYAN, ARMINE VS STANLEY, MARK

Case Summary

On 08/20/2014 ADAMYAN, ARMINE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STANLEY, MARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0394

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMYAN ARMINE

Defendants

STANLEY MARK

NICHOLS BRANDI

NICHOLS DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM, SHERYL

Defendant Attorneys

NICHOLS, BRANDI

NICHOLS, DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketCASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; APPLICATION FILED; RETURN TO ATTY SER/OR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketDEFAULT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46****

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • DocketMOTION FILED: MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING SET FOR 9/26/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • DocketA/C - MOTION FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketOSC SET 02/17/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less