This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 04:06:17 (UTC).

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC., A CORPORATION VS EDWARD URBAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDWARD URBAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1678

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

DAVIDSON DAWN

DEMIRJIAN YERVANT

URBAN EDWARD AKA EDWARD KLEIN URBAN DBA ON TOP ELECTRIC

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC

DAVIDSON BILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAGAN JOHN

Defendant Attorney

ALLEN SEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice Stipulation Regarding Fund Disbursement

9/16/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Stipulation Regarding Fund Disbursement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice Amended Notice of Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder

6/24/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Amended Notice of Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice Amended Notice of Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder

4/20/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Amended Notice of Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/13/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/23/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/7/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer - Answer

2/14/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/18/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/18/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Complaint - Complaint

12/23/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/23/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/23/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion re: to Deposit by Stakeholder: Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder scheduled for 09/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/28/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Stipulation Regarding Fund Disbursement; Filed by: Dawn Davidson (Defendant); Bill Davidson (Defendant); As to: Dawn Davidson (Defendant); Bill Davidson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice Amended Notice of Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder scheduled for 07/22/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/28/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Amended Notice of Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Onesource Distributors, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Onesource Distributors, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 01/09/2020; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Edward Urban (Defendant); Onesource Distributors, LLC (Defendant); Dawn Davidson (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Edward Urban (Defendant); Onesource Distributors, LLC (Defendant); Dawn Davidson (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Edward Urban (Defendant); Onesource Distributors, LLC (Defendant); Dawn Davidson (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11678    Hearing Date: September 28, 2020    Dept: 26

Accredited Casualty & Surety Co., Inc. v. Urban , et al.

MOTION TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER, FOR DISCHARGE OF STAKEHOLDER, FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES; AND FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

(CCP §§ 386, 386.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Accredited Surety & Casualty Company, Inc.’s Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder; for Discharge of Stakeholder; and Request for Attorney’s Fees is GRANTED AS TO THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR INTERPLEADER. INTERPLEADER FUNDS OF $12,600.00 TO BE DEPOSITED WITHIN 30 DAYS. Trial remains scheduled for June 21, 2021 at 8:30 am in Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse.

On December 23, 2019, Plaintiff Accredited Casualty & Surety Co., Inc. (“Plaintiff”) initiated this action for indemnity, reimbursement and interpleader against Defendants Edward Urban aka Edward Klein Urban, individually (“Defendant Urban”) and dba On Top Electric (“Defendant On Top”); Onesource Distributors, Llc (“Defendant Onesource”); Dawn Davidson (“Defendant Dawn Davidson”); Bill Davidson (“Defendant Bill Davidson”); and Yervant Demirjian (“Defendant Demirjian”). This action arises from a dispute over construction Bond No. 10089293 (the “Bond”) in the penal sum of $15,000 for homeowner claimants or $7,500 for non-homeowner claimants. (Compl. ¶¶ 8, 26.) Pursuant to the Application and Indemnity Agreement, Defendants Urban and On Top agreed to indemnify Plaintiff in exchange for issuance of the Bond. (Id. ¶¶6-7.) Remaining Defendants are alleged to have made claims on the Bond and are named only on the third cause of action for interpleader. (Id. at ¶¶8, 22-26.)

All Defendants having now answered the Complaint, in default, or dismissed from the action, Plaintiff brings the instant Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder, for Discharge of Stakeholder, for Attorney’s Fees, and for Temporary Restraining Order (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

Legal Standard

Interpleader is a procedure whereby a person holding money or personal property to which conflicting claims are being made by others, or may be made, can join the adverse claimants and force them to litigate their claims among themselves. (Code Civ. Proc., § 386, subd. (b).) Hancock Oil Co. v. Hopkins (1944) 24 Cal.2d 497, 508 (i.e., an escrow-holder who receives conflicting demands from the parties to the escrow regarding the funds or documents he or she holds); City of Morgan Hill v. Brown (1999) 71 Cal.App.4th 1114, 1122.)

Once the stakeholder’s right to interplead is established and he or she deposits the money or personal property in court, he or she may be discharged from liability to any of the claimants. This enables the stakeholder to avoid multiplicity of actions, and the risk of inconsistent results if each of the claimants were to sue him or her separately. (Cantu v. Resolution Trust Corp. (1992) 4 Cal.App.4th 857, 874; City of Morgan Hill, supra, 71 Cal.App.4th at 1122.)

“An interpleader action is traditionally viewed as two suits: one between the stakeholder and the claimants to determine the stakeholder's right to interplead, and the other among the claimants to determine who shall receive the funds interpleaded ... As against the stakeholder, claimants may raise only matters which go to whether the suit is properly one for interpleader; i.e., whether the elements of an interpleader action are present.” (State Farm Fire & Cas. Co. v. Pietak (2001) 90 Cal.App.4th 600, 612.)

The stakeholder may seek reimbursement for its costs and reasonable attorneys’ fees incurred. 

(UAP-Columbus JV 326132 v. Nesbitt (1991) 234 Cal.App.3d 1028, 1036.) The court may order payment thereof out of the funds deposited by the stakeholder. (Ibid.) Ultimately, such payment may be charged to one or more of the adverse claimants in the final judgment. (Code Civ. Proc., § 386.6.)

Finally, the Court may issue an “order restraining all parties to the action from instituting or further prosecuting any other proceeding in any court in this state affecting the rights and obligations as between the parties to the interpleader until further order of the court.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 386, subd. (f).)

Discussion

Plaintiff’s request to be discharged from liability on the first cause of action for interpleader is granted. As all claimants have been served with the Summons and Complaint, served with the instant motion, answered, are in default, or were dismissed from the action, relief is proper. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 386 and 386.5.) The subject matter of this action is $15,000.00. Currently, Plaintiff cannot determine the validity of the conflicting demands that have been made. (Motion, Pagan Decl., ¶¶6-8 and Exh. 2.) Upon deposit of the funds to the court, Plaintiff may be discharged from further liability and the Court hereby enters a restraining order to prevent the prosecution of other actions affecting the rights and obligations as between the parties to the interpleader. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 386.5, 386, subd. (f).)

Furthermore, the fees and costs sought by Plaintiff are proper. Plaintiff’s counsel has expended substantial attorneys’ fees and costs bringing this action and protecting itself from liability. Specifically, Plaintiff’s counsel filed the instant action and motion, served all Defendants, will appear at the instant hearing, will deposit the bond, and has sought to preserve the surplus funds. (Motion, Pagan Decl., ¶10 and Exh. 1.) Therefore, fees and costs are awarded to Plaintiff in the amount of $2,400.00. (Ibid.)

Plaintiff Accredited Surety & Casualty Company, Inc.’s Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder; for Discharge of Stakeholder; and Request for Attorney’s Fees is GRANTED AS TO THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR INTERPLEADER. INTERPLEADER FUNDS OF $12,600.00 TO BE DEPOSITED WITHIN 30 DAYS. Trial remains scheduled for June 21, 2021 at 8:30 am in Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse.

Moving party to give notice.