Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 07:41:22 (UTC).

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC., A CORPORATION VS AVA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0247

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

AVA INC. DBA RELIABLE ROOFING A CORPORATION

GALLEGOS JESUS

HERMANN CLARISSE

DODSON CORA

HARGIN CAROL

KALASHYAN VAHE AKA VAHE GEVORKOVICH KALASHYAN

GALLEGOS PATRICIA

KOPROWSKI SHERI

HOGAN BRENDA

RAMIREZ MARIA FRANCIA

AGUIRRE MONICA

BAIRD TINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAGAN JOHN

Defendant Attorneys

HAGOPIAN SHANT H.

COOK DONALD W.

SILVERBERG ROBERT

HAGOPIAN SHANT HAROUT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/4/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder)

Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: to Deposit by Stakeholder

8/17/2020: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: to Deposit by Stakeholder

Answer - Answer

4/17/2020: Answer - Answer

General Denial - General Denial

3/16/2020: General Denial - General Denial

Answer - Answer

3/20/2020: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/10/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - Answer

2/28/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

2/28/2020: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/18/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/21/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/9/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • Hearing07/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continued Hearing on Motion to Deposit; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder scheduled for 05/17/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deposit by Stakeholder)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase numbers 20STLC00247, 20CHCV00119 are related; case number 20CHCV00119 is the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F47 - Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Clarisse Hermann (Defendant); Service Date: 01/31/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Brenda Hogan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ava, Inc. (Defendant); Vahe Kalashyan (Defendant); Carol Hargin (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ava, Inc. (Defendant); Vahe Kalashyan (Defendant); Carol Hargin (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ava, Inc. (Defendant); Vahe Kalashyan (Defendant); Carol Hargin (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC00247    Hearing Date: March 15, 2021    Dept: 26

Accredited Casualty & Surety Co., Inc. v. Ava, Inc., et al.

MOTION TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER, FOR DISCHARGE OF STAKEHOLDER, FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES; AND FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

(CCP §§ 386, 386.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Accredited Casualty & Surety Co., Inc.’s Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder, for Discharge of Stakeholder, and Request for Attorney Fees is CONTINUED TO MAY 17, 2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On January 9, 2020, Plaintiff Accredited Casualty & Surety Co., Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed this action for indemnity, reimbursement and interpleader against Defendant Ava, Inc. dba Reliable Roofing (“Defendant Ava”) and others.

This action arises from a dispute over construction Bond No. 10096716 (the “Bond”) in the penal sum of $15,000 for homeowner claimants or $7,500 for non-homeowner claimants. (Compl., ¶¶ 7, 25.) Pursuant to the Application and Indemnity Agreement, Defendants Ava and Vahe Kalashyan aka Vahe Gevorkovich Kalashyan agreed to indemnify Plaintiff in exchange for issuance of the Bond. (Id. ¶¶6-7.) The remaining Defendants are alleged to have made claims on the Bond and are named only on the third cause of action for interpleader. (Id. at ¶¶7, 19-25.)

On February 28, 2020, Defendant Ava filed a Notice of Related Case with respect to Old Republic Surety Company v. Ava, Inc., LASC Case No. 19STLC02486.

On April 15, 2020, Defendant Ava filed Two Notices of Related Case. The first, in 19STLC02486, which identified this action, 20STCL00247, and Aguirre v. Quality Roofing Group, Inc., LASC Case No. 20CHCV00119, as related cases. The second, in 20CHCV00119, which identified this action, 20STCL00247, 19STLC02486, as related cases.

On April 17, 2020, the court in LASC Case No. 20CHCV00119 related LASC Case No. 19STLC02486 and ordered the matter to be re-assigned to Judge Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 at Chatsworth Courthouse for all purposes. It appears through inadvertence, the court neglected to make a ruling as to 20STLC00247, as it was listed on the same document.

20CHCV0019, therefore, is currently assigned to Department F47 at Chatsworth Courthouse and the ruling on the Notice of Related Case in this action must still be made by the judge in that department. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.300, subd. (h)(1)(B).)

The hearing on Plaintiff’s Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder, for Discharge of Stakeholder, and Request for Attorney Fees is CONTINUED TO MAY 17, 2021 AT 10:30 AM.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVA INC. DBA RELIABLE ROOFING is a litigant

Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGAN JOHN