This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2018 at 20:54:41 (UTC).

ACCESS MULTILINGUAL SERVICES INC. VS MARIO VALENCIA

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 ACCESS MULTILINGUAL SERVICES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIO VALENCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3170

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCESS MULTILINGUAL SERVICES INC.

11041 Santa Monica Blvd., #813

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant

VALENCIA MARIO DBA MARIO LAW OFFICE OF MARIO VALENCIA

Valencia, CA 91355

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/21/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Bench Warrant Recall) of 06/11/2018

6/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Bench Warrant Recall) of 06/11/2018

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/17/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

5/17/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 05/17/2018

5/17/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 05/17/2018

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/18/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

1/18/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 01/18/2018

1/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 01/18/2018

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

9/25/2017: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

9/1/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Certificate of Mailing for - [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]

9/11/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

6/21/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

4/24/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

4/24/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/24/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • Bench Warrant Recall scheduled for 06/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Minute Order (Bench Warrant Recall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Bench Warrant Recall) of 06/11/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Bench Warrant Recall scheduled for 06/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/11/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Bench Warrant - ORAP status updated to Recalled and Quashed on 06/11/2018; As to: Valencia, Mario ( Defendant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Updated -- Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 09/01/2017 to 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 05/17/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 05/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/17/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Access Multilingual Services Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mario Valencia (Defendant); Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170426E8636 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E8636 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Access Multilingual Services Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mario Valencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less