This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2020 at 00:10:44 (UTC).

ACAR LEASING LTD VS WILLIE ALBERT REAUX

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 ACAR LEASING LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIE ALBERT REAUX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0674

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACAR LEASING LTD DBA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED

Defendant

REAUX WILLIE ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERNEST STEVEN EUGENE

Defendant Attorney

KOZICH S. DAVID

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT WILLIE ALBERT REAUX, TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRO

10/2/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT WILLIE ALBERT REAUX, TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRO

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories...)

11/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

12/18/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/14/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/25/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Answer - Answer

3/29/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION HEARING OFF CALENDAR

3/12/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION HEARING OFF CALENDAR

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in support of application for writ of possession

2/7/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in support of application for writ of possession

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Application for writ of Possession and hearing

2/7/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Application for writ of Possession and hearing

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

2/7/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Steven E. Ernest re: Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code 2984.4

1/17/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Steven E. Ernest re: Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code 2984.4

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/17/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/17/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/17/2019: Complaint - Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Willie Albert Reaux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Acar Leasing LTD on 01/17/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Acar Leasing LTD as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Acar Leasing LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Willie Albert Reaux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Acar Leasing LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions scheduled for 11/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 11/20/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT WILLIE ALBERT REAUX, TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS CCP 2030.290,; Filed by: Acar Leasing LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Willie Albert Reaux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions scheduled for 11/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Acar Leasing LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Willie Albert Reaux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Acar Leasing LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Willie Albert Reaux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Steven E. Ernest re: Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code 2984.4; Filed by: Acar Leasing LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Willie Albert Reaux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Acar Leasing LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Willie Albert Reaux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC00674    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: 94

Acar Leasing Ltd. v. Reaux et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300; 2033.280)

   

Tentative:

ANALYSIS:  

Plaintiff Acar Leasing Ltd. (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for possession of personal property and breach of contract against Defendant Willie Albert Reaux on January 17, 2019.  On October 2, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant discovery motion (“Motion”) on July 2, 2019.  To date, no opposition has been filed.

It is undisputed that Defendant Willie Albert Reaux has not provided any verified responses to the discovery at issue propounded by Plaintiff.  (Motion, Ernest Decl., ¶¶ 3-12, Exhs. A-E.)  There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed.  Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses.  Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff is entitled to an order that Defendant serve verified responses to the interrogatories and document demands, without objections.  (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.)  The responses are due within 20 days.  Plaintiff is also entitled to an order deeming the requests for admission admitted against Defendant. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.)

The Court finds Defendant’s failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process.  (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).)  Sanctions have been sufficiently noticed; however, the amount requested is excessive given the simplicity of this Motion.  Defendant Willie Albert Reaux is ordered to pay sanctions in the amount of $630, based on two (2) hours of attorney time billed at $195 an hour, plus four filing fees of $60 each, within 30 days.  (Motion, Ernest Decl., ¶¶ 15-16.)

Moving party to give notice.