This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 00:06:42 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE USA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS HUMERA ABDUL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 ABSOLUTE USA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HUMERA ABDUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1699

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

DAREDIA NICK DBA STAR ELECTRONIC WHOLESALE

ABDUL HUMERA DBA STAR ELECTRONIC WHOLESALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUBINFELD JONATHAN

ROSHAN-ZAMIR PERRY

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/23/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/23/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/23/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

6/21/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/21/2021

6/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/21/2021

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

10/15/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Absolute USA, Inc., a California corporation on 12/23/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/21/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Absolute USA, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Absolute USA, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Humera Abdul (Defendant); NICK DAREDIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Absolute USA, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Humera Abdul (Defendant); NICK DAREDIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Absolute USA, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Humera Abdul (Defendant); NICK DAREDIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABSOLUTE USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBINFELD JONATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERRY ROSHAN-ZAMIR