Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 19:45:23 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC VS EVELYN NAJMI, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EVELYN NAJMI, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7289

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

NAJMI AN INDIVIDUAL EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGAFFEY DAVID C.

Defendant Attorney

ABDOLHOSSEINI TINA H.

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

1/4/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/4/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

1/5/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

11/16/2020: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/16/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

11/16/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Complaint - Complaint

11/16/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/16/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • Hearing11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant); As to: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC (Plaintiff); Mailing Date: 01/04/2021; Service Cost: 0.36; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant); As to: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 11/28/2020; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EVELYN NAJMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TINA ABDOLHOSSEINI H.