This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 02:25:17 (UTC).

ABEL DE LA OSSA VS ANYTIME RENT A CAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 ABEL DE LA OSSA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANYTIME RENT A CAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7072

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA OSSA ABEL

Defendants

ANYTIME RENT A CAR DBA ANYTIME AUTO GROUP

TOP FINANCE COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

3/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continued Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal

3/3/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continued Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/9/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

11/24/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

11/30/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

11/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/12/2020

11/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/12/2020

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Kasra Sadr in support of Petition to Conform Arbitration Award

11/2/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Kasra Sadr in support of Petition to Conform Arbitration Award

Reply (name extension) - Reply Petitioner's Reply in support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Request for Additional Fees

11/2/2020: Reply (name extension) - Reply Petitioner's Reply in support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Request for Additional Fees

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

9/24/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/14/2020

9/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/14/2020

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Petitioner's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/28/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Petitioner's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Of Kasra Sadr In Support Of Petition To Confirm The Arbitration Award

8/20/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Of Kasra Sadr In Support Of Petition To Confirm The Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/20/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by Abel De La Ossa on 08/20/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Abel De La Ossa as to Anytime Rent a Car and Top Finance Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continued Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal; Filed by: Abel De La Ossa (Plaintiff); As to: Anytime Rent a Car (Defendant); Top Finance Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/10/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 12/01/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOpposition to Petitioner's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Anytime Rent a Car (Defendant); Top Finance Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Abel De La Ossa (Plaintiff); As to: Anytime Rent a Car (Defendant); Top Finance Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Of Kasra Sadr In Support Of Petition To Confirm The Arbitration Award; Filed by: Abel De La Ossa (Plaintiff); As to: Anytime Rent a Car (Defendant); Top Finance Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Abel De La Ossa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC07072    Hearing Date: December 01, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Tue., December 1, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: De La Ossa v. Anytime Rent a Car, et al. PET. FILED: 08-20-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC07072

NOTICE: NO (continued hearing)

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Abel De La Ossa

RESP. PARTY: Respondents Anytime Rent a Car and Top Finance Company Inc.

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Abel De La Ossa’s Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO JAN 11, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE to allow the parties to continue their settlement efforts pursuant to the Notice of Settlement filed on November 24, 2020.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on August 28, 2020 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: Filed on November 2, 2020 [ ] Late [ ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On August 20, 2020, Petitioner Abel De La Ossa (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award against Respondents Anytime Rent a Car dba Anytime Auto Group (“Anytime”) and Top Finance Company, Inc. (“Top Finance”) (collectively, “Respondents”). Respondents filed an Opposition on August 28, 2020 and Petitioner filed a Reply on November 2, 2020.

On November 24, 2020, Petitioner filed a Notice of Settlement of the Entire Case, indicating the parties reached a conditional settlement and that a request for dismissal would be filed no later than January 8, 2021. Accordingly, the matter is CONTINUED to allow the parties to finalize their settlement efforts.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Abel De La Ossa’s Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO JAN 11, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE to allow the parties to continue their settlement efforts pursuant to the Notice of Settlement filed on November 24, 2020.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Top Finance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA