This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 01:18:02 (UTC).

AAYLEEN FLORES VS DANIEL ADRIAN FLORES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 AAYLEEN FLORES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL ADRIAN FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3948

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Defendants

FLORES DANIEL ADRIAN

Long Beach, CA 90805

FLORES RAUL

Long Beach, CA 90805

LOPEZ FRANCISCA

Long Beach, CA 90805

Not Classified By Court

FLORES ISELA

Compton, CA 90222

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/18/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Notice of Postponement

10/11/2018: Notice of Postponement

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/11/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/23/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

8/24/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/15/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Aayleen Flores on 08/15/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/08/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/08/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 02/08/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Aayleen Flores (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Aayleen Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Flores (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/11/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Aayleen Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Francisca Lopez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/11/2018; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Aayleen Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Adrian Flores (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Isela Flores (Non-Party); As to: Aayleen Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Aayleen Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Adrian Flores (Defendant); Francisca Lopez (Defendant); Raul Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less