This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2016 at 09:58:45 (UTC).

AAE PROPERTIES LLC VS WINATA, CHANDRIKA

Case Summary

On 03/02/2016 AAE PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WINATA, CHANDRIKA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0973

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAE PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants

WINATA CHANDRIKA

JUSTICE INVESTMENTS LLC

HEUER PETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM, LANE

Defendant Attorney

KENNINGER ESQ., SHIRLEY A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2016
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED INTO LC103846 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • TRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE [LC103846] FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR JUSTICE +

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE TRIAL CONTINUANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 05/25/16 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. NWH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING +

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING FILED/SIGNED BY +

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • APPLICATION & ORDER TO POST SUMMONS RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • OSC SET 08/29/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNINGER SHIRLEY ANN