This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2016 at 06:22:42 (UTC).

AAE PROPERTIES LLC VS MENDAVIA, MELBA

Case Summary

On 03/25/2016 AAE PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MENDAVIA, MELBA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3522

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAE PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

MENDAVIA MELBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED-RETURNED TO ATTY SVC/VKB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 1 HR(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER(CIVIL CODE PRO. 170.6) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER(CIVIL CODE PRO. 170.6) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • CCP SECTION 170.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • OSC SET 09/21/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant