This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 00:46:22 (UTC).

AABLE SECURITIES INC. VS AVALOS, SONDRA THEODORE

Case Summary

On 03/04/2015 AABLE SECURITIES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AVALOS, SONDRA THEODORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1652

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AABLE SECURITIES INC.

Defendant

AVALOS SONDRA THEODORE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Order - Case File Destroyed per Section(s) 71008 and/or 68152 of the Government Code; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/11/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 07/08/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ING457579007. HEARING SET FOR 05/11/15 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AABLE SECURITY is a litigant