This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 01:39:41 (UTC).

AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE, INC. VS ISHIKAWA, JOHN K.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 AAA T L C HEALTH CARE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ISHIKAWA, JOHN K. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3063

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC.

Defendant

ISHIKAWA JOHN K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANNING&KASS,ELLROD,RAMIREZ,TRESTER

MANNING&KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER

Defendant Attorneys

LEVINSON ARSHONSKY & KURTZ, LLP

LEVINSON ARSHONSKY & KURTZ LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • TSC HELD, MINUTES FILED-TRIAL DATE SET FOR 01/11/17 DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • TSC HELD, MINUTES FILED-TRIAL DATE SET FOR 01/11/17 DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER FILED. NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL-RECLASSIFICAATION FILED. CLERK'S NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL-RECLASSIFICAATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED. NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • TSC. SET 01/11/16, 0830 AM, DEPT 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - PLAINTIFF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - DEFENDANT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER - RE RECLASSIFICATION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION MINUTE ORDER - RE RECLASSIFICATION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • TRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC is a litigant