Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 12:37:28 (UTC).

965 VENDOME PARTNERS LLC VS FLORES, FRANCISCO

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 965 VENDOME PARTNERS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES, FRANCISCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9968

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

965 VENDOME PARTNERS LLC

Defendant

FLORES FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE FIDLER & CHAPLAN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2015
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DOES DISMISSAL FILED. DOES DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • A/C TRIAL SETTING REQUEST REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED: RETURNED BY MAIL/KE WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED: RETURNED BY MAIL/KE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR THE UNNAMED TENANTS FILED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR THE UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DEFAULT AS TO THE UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46 DEFAULT AS TO THE UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • OSC SET 02/16/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less