This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2020 at 06:19:09 (UTC).

915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS, LP VS ALBERT MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALBERT MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3969

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS LP

Defendant

MARTINEZ ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

12/31/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/31/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Albert Martinez)

12/31/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Albert Martinez)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/31/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/31/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/31/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/24/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/24/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1/28/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

1/29/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3/9/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 33.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Martinez (Defendant); Service Date: 01/08/2020; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Albert Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 01/08/2020; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Albert Martinez; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP on 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP against Defendant Albert Martinez on the Complaint filed by 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP on 12/31/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 915 Highland Avenue, # 94, Duarte, CA 91010 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 915 Highland Avenue Partners, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS