This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 07:10:50 (UTC).

850 CROFT CONDOMINUIMS HOMEOWN VS. JOHNSON, CAROLYN V

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 850 CROFT CONDOMINUIMS HOMEOWN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON, CAROLYN V. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2683

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK A. YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

850 CROFT CONDOMINUIMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIF CORP

Defendant

JOHNSON CAROLYN V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK AND ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK ESQ

Attorney at DENNIS P. BLOCK AND ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF GHASSAN O HASAN - GHASSAN O HASAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GHASSAN O HASAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2016
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/09/16 , FOR (850 CROFT CONDOMINUIMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) A CALIF CORP , AGAINST (JOHNSON, CAROLYN V) , PAST DUE RENT $ 12254.72 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 0.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 12,254.72 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 850 N. CROFT AVE., #301 LOS ANGELES, CA 90069 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • WRIT RECEIVED AS TO POSSESSION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UPON DEFAULT AND PROCEEDING WITH ENFORCEMENT FILED. FILE SENT TO DEPT. WES . RECEIPT # SM500862023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. MARK A. YOUNG PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION FOR UNSEALING OF FILE MOTION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF TO NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • ** RECORD NOW AVAILABLE PURSUANT TO THE TERMS OF THE COURT ORDER **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • CASE RESTORED TO ACTIVE STATUS FOR THE FOLLOWING ADMINISTRATIVE REASON{S}: X

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS SERVED CAROLYN JOHNSON, DEFENDANT ON 6/11/16 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED AS TO (JOHNSON, CAROLYN V) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (JOHNSON, CAROLYN V) . RECEIPT # SM27886819 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM278865013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE MARK A. YOUNG .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 12/05/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . .

    Read MoreRead Less