This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2019 at 01:04:13 (UTC).

7251 MILWOOD AVENUE, INC VS S. B. KRASNOFF, INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 7251 MILWOOD AVENUE, INC filed an Other lawsuit against S B KRASNOFF, INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8857

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

7251 MILWOOD AVENUE INC

Defendant

S. B. KRASNOFF INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMERON PARRY GLENN

Defendant Attorney

PETERSEN RICHARD PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/26/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/23/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer - Answer

11/1/2018: Answer - Answer

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION AND FOR COSTS INCLUDING REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES;

4/26/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION AND FOR COSTS INCLUDING REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES;

Complaint

6/25/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

6/25/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/25/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by 7251 Milwood Avenue, INC on 06/25/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by 7251 Milwood Avenue, INC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: 7251 Milwood Avenue, INC (Plaintiff); As to: S. B. Krasnoff, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant to Compel Plaintiff to Appear for Deposition and for Costs Including Reasonable Attorney's Fees scheduled for 12/02/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Hearing on Motion to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant to Compel Plaintiff to Appear for Deposition and for Costs Including Reasonable Attorney's Fees scheduled for 09/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/02/2019 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION AND FOR COSTS INCLUDING REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES;; Filed by: S. B. Krasnoff, Incorporated (Defendant); As to: 7251 Milwood Avenue, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant to Compel Plaintiff to Appear for Deposition and for Costs Including Reasonable Attorney's Fees scheduled for 09/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: S. B. Krasnoff, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 7251 Milwood Avenue, INC (Plaintiff); As to: S. B. Krasnoff, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 7251 Milwood Avenue, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC08857    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 94

Milwood Avenue, Inc. v. S.B. Krasnoff, Inc., et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2025.450)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant S.B. Krasnoff, Inc.’s Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff’s Attendance at Deposition and for Monetary Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

ANALYSIS

Plaintiff 7251 Milwood Avenue, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for nuisance, trespass, negligence, declaratory relief, and injunctive relief against Defendant S.B. Krasnoff, Inc. (“Defendant”) (erroneously sued as Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC) on June 25, 2018. Defendant filed the instant motion to compel Plaintiff’s attendance at deposition on April 26, 2019. To date, no opposition has been filed.

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court lacks jurisdiction to grant the relief sought in the Complaint. Specifically, the requests for declaratory relief and permanent injunctive relief are outside the jurisdiction of this Court. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subds. (a)(7), (b).) This case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

Court clerk to give notice.