This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 05:33:11 (UTC).

667 BERENDO ASSOCIATES LTD VS SERGIO ONTIVEROS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 667 BERENDO ASSOCIATES LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SERGIO ONTIVEROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9370

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

667 BERENDO ASSOCIATES LTD

Defendants

MATHIESON MILES

ONTIVEROS SERGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN EDWARD LUIS

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

10/23/2018: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

10/17/2018: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

10/16/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/9/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Posting

10/9/2018: Proof of Service by Posting

Proof of Service by Posting

10/9/2018: Proof of Service by Posting

Application for Order to Post

9/13/2018: Application for Order to Post

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Sergio Ontiveros)

8/30/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Sergio Ontiveros)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/30/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Miles Mathieson)

8/30/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Miles Mathieson)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

8/29/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - on Complaint

8/29/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

8/29/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

2/26/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: 667 Berendo Associates Ltd (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 114.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff 667 Berendo Associates Ltd a California Limited Partnership against Defendant Miles Mathieson and Defendant Sergio Ontiveros on the Complaint filed by 667 Berendo Associates Ltd on 08/29/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 665 Berendo Street, Los Angeles, CA 90004 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: 667 Berendo Associates Ltd (Plaintiff); As to: Miles Mathieson (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/21/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: 667 Berendo Associates Ltd (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Ontiveros (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/21/2018; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: 667 Berendo Associates Ltd (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Ontiveros (Defendant); Miles Mathieson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Sergio Ontiveros; Miles Mathieson; On the Complaint filed by 667 Berendo Associates Ltd on 08/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Signed and Filed by: 667 Berendo Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 667 Berendo Associates Ltd (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Ontiveros (Defendant); Miles Mathieson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 667 Berendo Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS