This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2020 at 05:34:09 (UTC).

6356 VAN NUYS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS ILONA KRASOVSKAYA

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 6356 VAN NUYS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ILONA KRASOVSKAYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0447

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

6356 VAN NUYS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

KRASOVSKAYA ILONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDMAN STEPHEN MARK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/21/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Ilona Krasovskaya)

2/21/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Ilona Krasovskaya)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

2/20/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/20/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: 6356 Van Nuys, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ilona Krasovskaya (Defendant); Service Date: 02/20/2020; Service Cost: 1.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 6356 Van Nuys, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ilona Krasovskaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 6356 Van Nuys, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ilona Krasovskaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 6356 Van Nuys, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ilona Krasovskaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jessica A. Uzcategui in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN STEPHEN MARK