This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 19:29:02 (UTC).

5445 LANKERSHIM BOULEVARD APARTMENT INVESTORS, LLC VS EDDIE BARNES

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 5445 LANKERSHIM BOULEVARD APARTMENT INVESTORS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EDDIE BARNES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0441

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

5445 LANKERSHIM BOULEVARD APARTMENT INVESTORS LLC

Defendant

BARNES EDDIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLENBECK LINDA TRACEY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/17/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

3/17/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/17/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/17/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/11/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/11/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/11/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Eddie Barnes)

2/11/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Eddie Barnes)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Eddie Barnes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Barnes (Defendant); Service Date: 02/13/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Barnes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Barnes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 86.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/13/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Eddie Barnes; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC on 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC against Defendant Eddie Barnes on the Complaint filed by 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC on 02/11/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 5440 N. Tujunga Ave. #515, North Hollywood, CA 91601 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Barnes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Barnes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Barnes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5445 LANKERSHIM BOULEVARD APARTMENT INVESTORS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - LINDA T. HOLLENBECK ESQ