This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:18:20 (UTC).

508 GULF STREET, LLC VS BENITEZ, ERIKA

Case Summary

On 03/07/2013 508 GULF STREET, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BENITEZ, ERIKA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0232

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

508 GULF STREET LLC

Defendant

BENITEZ ERIKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2013
  • AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT TO CCP 1169 FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF COMPLAINT PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.