This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/20/2020 at 09:38:25 (UTC).

3600 WILSHIRE, LLC VS IP KOREA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 3600 WILSHIRE, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against IP KOREA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1367

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3600 WILSHIRE LLC

Defendant

IP KOREA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHO DIANA

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/7/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/7/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/7/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (IP Korea, Inc., a California Corporation)

2/11/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (IP Korea, Inc., a California Corporation)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/11/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

4/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • Hearing07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department Civil Cler at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/10/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: 3600 Wilshire, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: IP Korea, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to IP Korea, Inc., a California Corporation; On the Complaint filed by 3600 Wilshire, LLC on 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: 3600 Wilshire, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: IP Korea, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/21/2020; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 3600 Wilshire, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: IP Korea, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 3600 Wilshire, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: IP Korea, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 3600 Wilshire, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: IP Korea, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3600 WILSHIRE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHO DIANA