This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 02:07:34 (UTC).

338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC VS SAM PEPPER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SAM PEPPER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8448

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC

Defendants

HAUNTED YOUTH PRODUCTIONS LLC

PEPPER SAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIVOLI MICHAEL WARREN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/7/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

8/7/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Continuance of OSC re Failure to Prosecute the Case

3/14/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Continuance of OSC re Failure to Prosecute the Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3/19/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - Minute Order (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS)

2/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Michael L. Federici re OSC re Failure to Prosecute

2/5/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Michael L. Federici re OSC re Failure to Prosecute

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/7/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

8/7/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Haunted Youth Productions LLC)

8/8/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Haunted Youth Productions LLC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/8/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Sam Pepper)

8/8/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Sam Pepper)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

9/10/2018: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions scheduled for 04/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: 338 South Avenue 16 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sam Pepper (Defendant); Haunted Youth Productions LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: 338 South Avenue 16 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sam Pepper (Defendant); Haunted Youth Productions LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by 338 South Avenue 16 LLC on 08/07/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by 338 South Avenue 16 LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketNotice Notice of Continuance of OSC re Failure to Prosecute the Case; Filed by: 338 South Avenue 16 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sam Pepper (Defendant); Haunted Youth Productions LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 04/08/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Michael L. Federici re OSC re Failure to Prosecute; Filed by: 338 South Avenue 16 LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 91 - Hon. Thomas D. Long; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 338 South Avenue 16 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sam Pepper (Defendant); Haunted Youth Productions LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Sanctions scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 338 South Avenue 16 LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions scheduled for 04/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIVOLI MICHAEL WARREN