This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 00:16:20 (UTC).

3200 LAKEWOOD, LP VS WEBB, ARTHUR TRISMAN

Case Summary

On 03/28/2016 3200 LAKEWOOD, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WEBB, ARTHUR TRISMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1434

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3200 LAKEWOOD LP

Defendant

WEBB ARTHUR TRISMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAM M GARRETT, JR, ATTY AT LAW - WILLIAM M GARRETT JR

Attorney at WILLIAM M GARRETT, JR, ATTY AT LAW

GARRETT WILLIAM M JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 145.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/25/16 , FOR (3200 LAKEWOOD, LP) , AGAINST (WEBB, ARTHUR TRISMAN) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3200 E. SOUTH STREET #623 LAKEWOOD, CA 90805 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PRD . PICKUP BOX UNDER 'SNAP LEGAL'

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (WEBB, ARTHUR TRISMAN) , AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (WEBB, ARTHUR TRISMAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED AS TO (WEBB, ARTHUR TRISMAN) , ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ON 04/19/16 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 28.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN LB271543024. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 09/26/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT S12 . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3200 LAKEWOOD LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARRETT, WILLIAM M.