This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 01:14:23 (UTC).

3200 LAKEWOOD, LP VS ERTHA GORDON

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 3200 LAKEWOOD, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ERTHA GORDON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0519

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3200 LAKEWOOD LP

Defendant

GORDON ERTHA

Long Beach, CA 90805

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT WILLIAM MILFORD JR

 

Court Documents

Application for Order to Post

3/2/2018: Application for Order to Post

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

3/15/2018: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment

3/28/2018: Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment

Application for Writ of Possession

4/5/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ - Return

5/8/2018: Writ - Return

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/28/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

3/15/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Answer

2/15/2018: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/15/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

2/8/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

2/8/2018: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Ertha Gordon)

2/9/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Ertha Gordon)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/8/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

4/6/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: 3200 Lakewood, LP (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 30.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 updated: Result Date to 03/28/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Premise address is amended to 3200 E South Street #121, Lakewood, CA 90805.; Stipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff 3200 Lakewood, LP against Defendant Ertha Gordon on the Complaint filed by 3200 Lakewood, LP on 02/08/2018 for holdover damages $1,830.00, attorney fees of $500.00, and costs of $240.00 for a total of $2,570.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 3200 E South Street #121, Lakewood, CA 90805 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.; Writ to issue forthwith, but no lockout prior to 04/29/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment; Filed by: 3200 Lakewood, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Ertha Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: 3200 Lakewood, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ertha Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: 3200 Lakewood, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Ertha Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 3200 Lakewood, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3200 LAKEWOOD LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARRETT, WILLIAM M.