This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2016 at 12:49:53 (UTC).

218 PROPERTIES,LLC VS. MITCHELL, J. THOMAS

Case Summary

On 07/29/2013 218 PROPERTIES,LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MITCHELL, J THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5557

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

218 PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

MITCHELL J. THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS W. BECK & ASSOC. - DOUGLAS W. BECK

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS W. BECK & ASSOC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 110.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PRD . MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 11.05 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/21/13 . FOR (218 PROPERTIES,LLC), A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . AGAINST (MITCHELL, J. THOMAS) AN INDIVIDUAL . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 218 W. CARSON SPACE 19 CARSON, CA 90745 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MITCHELL, J. THOMAS) , AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED & DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MITCHELL, J. THOMAS) AN INDIVIDUAL ON 08/16/13 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED. COMPLETE ZIP CODE ON COMPLAINT (90745) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PRD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 01/27/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 218 PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK DOUGLAS W. ESQ.