Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 19:10:57 (UTC).

218 PROPERTIES LLC, VS ABANDONED MOBILEHOME AT PARK G

Case Summary

On 03/06/2013 218 PROPERTIES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ABANDONED MOBILEHOME AT PARK G. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and JEFFERY K. WINIKOW. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0530

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

JEFFERY K. WINIKOW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

218 PROPERTIES LLC A CALIF LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ABANDONED MOBILEHOME AT PARK GRANADA TRAILER LODGE 218 W. CARSON SPACE 3 CA

ABANDONED MOBILEHOME AT PARK GRANADA TRAILER LODGE 218 W. CARSON SPACE 3 CARSON CA.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS W. BECJ & ASSO. - DOUGLAS W. BECK

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS W. BECJ & ASSO.

BECK DOUGLAS W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INVENTORY OF CONTENTS OF ABANDONED MOBILE HOME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS W. BECK IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL PRESIDING FOR PROVE-UP HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING DOUGLAS W. BECK . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/23/14 . FOR (218 PROPERTIES LLC,) A CALIF LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . AGAINST (ABANDONED MOBILEHOME AT PARK GRANADA TRAILER LODGE 218 W. CARSON, SPACE 3 CARSON, CA.) . PRINCIPAL $ 9082.69 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 7000.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 285.00 . TOTAL $ 16,367.69 . MOBILEHOME ON SPACE 3 AT 218 W. CARSON, CARSON, CA IS DECLARED ABANDONED PURSUANT TO CIV. CODE SEC. 798.6. PETITIONER SHALL COMPLY WITH SUBSECTIONS (E),(F),(G) AND (H) OF SEC. 798.61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL PRESIDING FOR PROVE-UP HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING DOUGLAS W. BECK . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. JEFFERY K. WINIKOW PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT. . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: EX PARTE APPLICATION IS GRANTED IN PART. THE COURT SETS A DEFAULT PROVE UP DATE ON 10/23/14 AT 01:30 P.M. IN DEPARTMENT 77. THE COURT DEEMS THE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO BE THE MOVING PAPERS FOR THE DEFAULT PROVE UP. NOTICE IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 10/23/14 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 077 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 077 , HON. JEFFERY K. WINIKOW PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT. . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: EX PARTE APPLICATION IS GRANTED IN PART. THE COURT SETS A DEFAULT PROVE UP DATE ON 10/23/14 AT 01:30 P.M. IN DEPARTMENT 77. THE COURT DEEMS THE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO BE THE MOVING PAPERS FOR THE DEFAULT PROVE UP. NOTICE IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ABANDONED MOBILEHOME AT PARK GRANADA TRAILER LODGE 218 W. CARSON, SPACE 3 CARSON, CA.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: PETITION FOR JUDICIAL DECLARATION OF ABANDONMENT OF MOBILE HOME; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; COVER SHEET ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ABANDONED MOBILEHOME AT PARK GRANADA TRAILER LODGE 218 W. CARSON, SPACE 3 CARSON, CA.) SUB SERVED JOSIE RODRIGUEZ (REGISTERED OWNER) . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (218 PROPERTIES LLC,) A CALIF LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT/PROOF OF SERVICE: PROOF OF SERVICE SHOWS BY POSTING. 1) THERE IS NO APPLICATION/ORDER FOR POSTING WITH $20.00 ISSUED. 2) PLEASE COMPLETE HIGHLIGHTED AREAS. SUBMITTED ON 04/11/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM13C00530 TO LAM13CC0530

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO SEE DEFAULT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketCIVIL PETITION FILED. RN PAID. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 218 PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK DOUGLAS W. ESQ.