This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2019 at 12:26:27 (UTC).

1750 SYCAMORE, LLC VS OGAN, CHRISTINE

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 1750 SYCAMORE, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OGAN, CHRISTINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NORMAN TARLE, MARK LUEVANO and NORMAN P. TARLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2119

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NORMAN TARLE

Presiding Judges

MARK LUEVANO

NORMAN P. TARLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1750 SYCAMORE LLC

Defendant

OGAN CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ

Attorney at H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

BOUZANE JOHN MARK

Other Attorneys

LONG HELEN GRAYCE ESQ

 

Court Documents

Declaration - lost original lease and order to enter judgment without attorney fees..

8/28/2017: Declaration - lost original lease and order to enter judgment without attorney fees..

Judgment Unlawful Detainer

8/28/2017: Judgment Unlawful Detainer

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/17/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - BY COURT

8/17/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - BY COURT

Substitution of Attorney

8/17/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

8/17/2017: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2017
  • Declaration lost original lease and order to enter judgment without attorney fees.. Filed by: (1750 SYCAMORE, LLC) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (1750 SYCAMORE, LLC) against Defendant (OGAN, CHRISTINE) on the Complaint filed by (1750 SYCAMORE, LLC) on 05/12/2017 for past rent due in the amount of $1,350.00, holdover damages $2,130.00, and costs of $485.00 for a total of $3,965.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: John Mark Bouzane (Attorney); As to: (1750 SYCAMORE, LLC) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment BY COURT; Filed by: (1750 SYCAMORE, LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTINE OGAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (1750 SYCAMORE, LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • On the Complaint filed by (1750 SYCAMORE, LLC) on 05/12/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (1750 SYCAMORE, LLC) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 145.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . MAILED SASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (OGAN, CHRISTINE) AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (OGAN, CHRISTINE) AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (OGAN, CHRISTINE) BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 5-12-17 . COSTS OF $ 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM624543011. Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/08/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE NORMAN TARLE .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE