Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2021 at 07:56:43 (UTC).

165 PROSPECT, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS WILLIAM DELEON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 165 PROSPECT, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM DELEON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9305

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

165 PROSPECT LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

DELEON WILLIAM

PISARO DEBORAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEB STEVEN S

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/10/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/27/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

1/27/2021: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/4/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/4/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/4/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2023
  • Hearing11/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by 165 PROSPECT, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company on 01/27/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by 165 PROSPECT, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company as to DEBORAH PISARO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAddress for STEVEN S LOEB (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 165 PROSPECT, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM DeLEON (Defendant); DEBORAH PISARO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: 165 PROSPECT, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM DeLEON (Defendant); DEBORAH PISARO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: 165 PROSPECT, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: DEBORAH PISARO (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 165 PROSPECT, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM DeLEON (Defendant); DEBORAH PISARO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 165 PROSPECT, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM DeLEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 165 PROSPECT, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM DeLEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOEB, STEVEN S