This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 04:43:35 (UTC).

DANNY EMERSON VS GRACE CHANG

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 DANNY EMERSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRACE CHANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4952

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERSON DANNY

Torrance, CA 90510

Defendant

CHANG GRACE

Cudahy, CA 90201

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/14/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/17/2017: Unknown

[Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

8/17/2017: [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

EXHIBITS RECEIPT

8/8/2017: EXHIBITS RECEIPT

Unknown

8/2/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/2/2017: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Ruling on Submitted Matter)

8/2/2017: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/1/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

[Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

5/16/2017: [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/16/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Danny Emerson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Grace Chang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Danny Emerson against Defendant Grace Chang on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Danny Emerson on 05/16/2017 for the principal amount of $1,000.00 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $1,100.00.; Other: Ms. Chang may satisfy this judgment in full by filing a partial satisfaction, to the extent of $1,100.00, of the judgment she obtained against Mr. Emerson in case #17F00828 EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/01/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Grace Chang (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Danny Emerson (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Chang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0014564 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $4.50; Payment: 4.50 Receipt: DW-2017-0014564 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less