This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 03:54:40 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS SPECKMAYOR, SUSAN V

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SPECKMAYOR, SUSAN V. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8700

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Defendant

SPECKMAYOR SUSAN V AKA SPECKMAYOR SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, APC - NICHOLAS W. LYNES

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP, APC

LYNES NICHOLAS W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

5/11/2017: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/11/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons

5/11/2017: Summons - Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: DILIGENCE

6/12/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: DILIGENCE

Declaration (name extension) - non service

5/8/2018: Declaration (name extension) - non service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/26/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

2/26/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

2/26/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/26/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Lost Instrument

2/26/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Lost Instrument

Judgment - Judgment

4/5/2019: Judgment - Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/22/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

5/1/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff); As to: SUSAN V SPECKMAYOR (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff); As to: SUSAN V SPECKMAYOR (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 10.60; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 37, col 39] with Document:70547291

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) against Defendant (SPECKMAYOR, SUSAN V) AKA (SPECKMAYOR, SUSAN) on the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 05/11/2017 for the principal amount of $3,462.34 and costs of $424.00 for a total of $3,886.34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff); As to: SUSAN V SPECKMAYOR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 8, col 47] with Document:70547291

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 04/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff); As to: SUSAN V SPECKMAYOR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1033; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 05/11/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA), does 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff); As to: SUSAN V SPECKMAYOR (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/26/2018; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration non service; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA637046128. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 04/27/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY RICK BROWN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK NA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynes, Nicholas W.