This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2017 at 08:48:22 (UTC).

ESTEBAN LARA, JR. VS VERONICA SALDANA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2017 ESTEBAN LARA, JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VERONICA SALDANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3588

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARA ESTEBAN JR. - JUNIOR

LARA ESTEBAN JUNIOR

LARA ESTEBAN JR.

Defendant

SALDANA VERONICA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/09/2017

11/9/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/09/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/9/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017

9/19/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/19/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/11/2017: Unknown

$40.00

9/5/2017: $40.00

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/3/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/03/2017

8/3/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/03/2017

Unknown

7/31/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service - No Service

6/16/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/16/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

6/16/2017: Notice of Postponement

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/4/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2017
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/09/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 11/09/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Address for Veronica Saldana (Defendant) court order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Veronica Saldana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department NE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 11/09/2017 08:30 AM at 11/09/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Esteban Lara, Junior (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Saldana (Defendant); Costs: 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Esteban Lara, Junior (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Updated -- Esteban Lara, Junior (Plaintiff): Name Suffix changed from JR. - Junior to Junior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from ESTEBAN LARA, JR. - JUNIOR vs VERONICA SALDANA to ESTEBAN LARA, JR. vs VERONICA SALDANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Esteban Lara, JR. - Junior (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Saldana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0012330 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less