This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2018 at 09:47:33 (UTC).

ABERA GEBRE VS RICARDO DELGADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 ABERA GEBRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICARDO DELGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3398

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEBRE ABERA

Inglewood, CA 90301

Defendants

PISTE ALVARO

Inglewood, CA 90301

DELGADO RICARDO

Inglewood, CA 90301

ALIAGA URSULA

Inglewood, CA 90301

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/07/2017

12/7/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/07/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/7/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/14/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017

8/14/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017

Unknown

8/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/7/2017: Unknown

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - RESET FROM COURTROOM

6/22/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - RESET FROM COURTROOM

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/5/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Due to Clerical Error, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 12/07/2017 08:30 AM at 12/07/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 10/11/2017 01:30 PM at 10/11/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Abera Gebre (Plaintiff); As to: Alvaro Piste (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Abera Gebre (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Delgado (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Abera Gebre (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Delgado (Defendant); Ursula Aliaga (Defendant); Alvaro Piste (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) RESET FROM COURTROOM; Filed by: Abera Gebre (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Abera Gebre (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Delgado (Defendant); Ursula Aliaga (Defendant); Alvaro Piste (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012567 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less