This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2017 at 00:02:09 (UTC).

PITAMBAR PAUDEL VS MIRANDA AUTO SALES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 PITAMBAR PAUDEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIRANDA AUTO SALES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3462

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAUDEL PITAMBAR

Rowland Height, CA 91748

Defendant

MIRANDA AUTO SALES INC.

1144 S. Hacienda Blvd

Hacienda Heigh, CA 91745

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Jose Castellanos

7/19/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Jose Castellanos

Minute Order of 07/19/2017

7/19/2017: Minute Order of 07/19/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/30/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/2/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

6/2/2017: Notice of Postponement

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/28/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/28/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/28/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 07/19/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jose Castellanos; Filed by: Miranda Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Pitambar Paudel (Plaintiff); As to: Miranda Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 130.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1170428E6043 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170428E6043 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pitambar Paudel (Plaintiff); As to: Miranda Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIRANDA'S AUTO is a litigant