Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 00:41:55 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS GONZALEZ, ARTHUR J

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALEZ, ARTHUR J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7994

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

0

DISCOVER BANK

0

GONZALEZ ARTHUR J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, PC - BIANCA BABAIANS ESQ

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, PC

BABAIANS BIANCA ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/25/2017: Complaint

Summons

4/25/2017: Summons

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/2/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Re: NON SERVICE

5/12/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Re: NON SERVICE

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

6/15/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Request for Dismissal

8/24/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - RE: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

8/24/2017: Declaration (name extension) - RE: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/24/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment

9/7/2017: Default Judgment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - IN OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

2/7/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - IN OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

2/7/2018: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

2/7/2018: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Claim of Exemption - Received from the Sheriff's Office

2/13/2018: Claim of Exemption - Received from the Sheriff's Office

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 03/05/2018

3/5/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 03/05/2018

Order Determining Claim Of Exemption

3/5/2018: Order Determining Claim Of Exemption

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

3/5/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/19/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 04/27/2018 ; Status Date changed from 09/07/2017 to 04/27/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: ARTHUR J GONZALEZ (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 03/05/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 03/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 03/05/2018; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketOrder Determining Claim Of Exemption; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketClaim of Exemption Received from the Sheriff's Office; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 03/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: ARTHUR J GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: ARTHUR J GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to ARTHUR J GONZALEZ; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GONZALEZ, ARTHUR J) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 04/09/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RECEIPT # CHA538853031 . Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BABAIANS BIANCA