This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 03:18:27 (UTC).

DIMITRI M. ANDERSON VS FRANK SALISBURY

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 DIMITRI M ANDERSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANK SALISBURY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3217

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON DIMITRI M.

Inglewood, CA 90302

Defendant

SALISBURY FRANK

Inglewood, CA 90302

 

Court Documents

Unknown

10/16/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/25/2017: Unknown

[Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

9/25/2017: [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Unknown

9/1/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/1/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/1/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 06/21/2017

6/21/2017: Minute Order of 06/21/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/9/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Dimitri M. Anderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Frank Salisbury (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 06/21/2017 to 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/01/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Dimitri M. Anderson against Defendant Frank Salisbury on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dimitri M. Anderson on 04/27/2017 for the principal amount of $377.72 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $447.72.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Dimitri M. Anderson (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Salisbury (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dimitri M. Anderson (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Salisbury (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012312 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less