This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 23:37:20 (UTC).

FELICIA J. SHELTON VS DONNELL LEE MURRAY

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 FELICIA J SHELTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DONNELL LEE MURRAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3210

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHELTON FELICIA J.

West Covina, CA 91792

Defendant

MURRAY DONNELL LEE

Los Angeles, CA 90044

 

Court Documents

Unknown

8/3/2017: Unknown

RETURNED MAIL - Minute Order of 6/23/17

7/3/2017: RETURNED MAIL - Minute Order of 6/23/17

Minute Order of 06/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/23/2017: Minute Order of 06/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

6/23/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

6/23/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

6/22/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 06/22/2017

6/22/2017: Minute Order of 06/22/2017

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/5/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/27/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Felicia J. Shelton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL Minute Order of 6/23/17; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Felicia J. Shelton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Felicia J. Shelton against Defendant Donnell Lee Murray on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Felicia J. Shelton on 04/27/2017 for the principal amount of $9,571.56 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $9,686.56.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Donnell Lee Murray. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/22/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Felicia J. Shelton (Plaintiff); As to: Donnell Lee Murray (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Felicia J. Shelton (Plaintiff); As to: Donnell Lee Murray (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Felicia J. Shelton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012304 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less