This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 03:18:01 (UTC).

CEDARS-SINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS NAIMAH L HARRIS

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 CEDARS-SINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NAIMAH L HARRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3208

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CEDARS-SINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

CEDARS-SINAI FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

8700 Beverly Bl 1631D

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant

HARRIS NAIMAH L

Inglewood, CA 90303

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/27/2018: Unknown

Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 02/27/2018

2/27/2018: Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 02/27/2018

(Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

2/27/2018: (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

MEMO TO COURT CLERK

2/5/2018: MEMO TO COURT CLERK

Unknown

1/26/2018: Unknown

(Los Angeles)

10/25/2017: (Los Angeles)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/6/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/6/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/6/2017: Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: "JANE DOE", CO-OCCUPANT

6/1/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: "JANE DOE", CO-OCCUPANT

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/2/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/26/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 02/27/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 02/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 02/27/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Other - MEMO TO COURT CLERK; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAI FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAI FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: NAIMAH L HARRIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 02/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Updated -- CEDARS-SINAI FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from CEDARS-SINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION to CEDARS-SINAI FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/06/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff CEDARS-SINAI FEDERAL CREDIT UNION against Defendant NAIMAH L HARRIS on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by CEDARS-SINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION on 04/26/2017 for the principal amount of $4,046.63 and costs of $145.00 for a total of $4,191.63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: "JANE DOE", CO-OCCUPANT; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: NAIMAH L HARRIS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/08/17; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: CEDARS-SINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012293 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: NAIMAH L HARRIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less