This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 23:37:09 (UTC).

YUKI UEHARA VS BRIAN JAMES COTE

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 YUKI UEHARA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRIAN JAMES COTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3207

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UEHARA YUKI

Torrance, CA 90502

Defendant

COTE BRIAN JAMES

Torrance, CA 90503

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

7/18/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

6/30/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration] NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE (CANCEL) JUDGMENT

6/30/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration] NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE (CANCEL) JUDGMENT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/22/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

6/22/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 06/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/22/2017: Minute Order of 06/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Yuki Uehara (Plaintiff); As to: Brian James Cote (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/18/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/22/2017 to 07/18/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/18/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/18/2017 to 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Brian James Cote (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014719 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration] NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE (CANCEL) JUDGMENT; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/22/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Yuki Uehara (Plaintiff); As to: Brian James Cote (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/28/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Yuki Uehara (Plaintiff); As to: Brian James Cote (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012292 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $2.00; Payment: 2.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012292 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less