This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 03:43:35 (UTC).

TONY LAFER VS CASA THEODORE, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 TONY LAFER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASA THEODORE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3202

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAFER TONY

Malibu, CA 90264

Defendant

CASA THEODORE INC.

P O Box 2127

Malibu, CA 90265

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 09/29/2017

9/29/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 09/29/2017

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

9/29/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

8/8/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/26/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

3/7/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/25/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/25/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/25/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/29/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - untimely

7/25/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - untimely

Rejection Sheet - ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL

7/17/2017: Rejection Sheet - ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

7/17/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection

7/17/2017: Notice of Rejection

Notice of Rejection

7/17/2017: Notice of Rejection

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/26/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/26/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/26/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2018 at 10:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 01/25/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Tony Lafer against Defendant Casa Theodore, Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tony Lafer on 04/26/2017 for the principal amount of $3,080.89 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $3,195.89.; Other: Evidence and testimony establishes the $5,650.00 security deposit refund should be reduced for the following: carpet ($1,512.00), window lock ($27.00), cleaning fee ($250.00), front door lock ($239.00), futon ($361.16), fireplace tools ($79.95), patching of walls/ceiling to prepare for painting ($100.00). Although there is insufficient evidence to justify defendant Casa Theodore, Inc. from withholding the remaining amounts listed in its April 5, 2017 Invoice to plaintiff Tony Lafer, the Court does not find bad faith by defendant. Nor does the Court find good cause to award further statutory damages to plaintiff pursuant to Government Code section 1950.5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/25/2018 10:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2018 at 10:15 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2018 at 10:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Balance: $5.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketPayment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $5.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0013542 (Cash)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170426E0271 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E0271 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tony Lafer (Plaintiff); As to: Casa Theodore, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less