This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 03:17:37 (UTC).

VIVIAN KAY STITZEL VS KAYLA GOMES

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 VIVIAN KAY STITZEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KAYLA GOMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3200

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STITZEL VIVIAN KAY

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant

GOMES KAYLA

Los Angeles, CA 90054

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/05/2017

9/5/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/05/2017

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/5/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/26/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order of 06/26/2017

6/26/2017: Minute Order of 06/26/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/26/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/26/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/26/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/05/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/05/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Defendant Kayla Gomes against Plaintiff Vivian Kay Stitzel on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Vivian Kay Stitzel on 04/26/2017 for a total of $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Vivian Kay Stitzel (Plaintiff); Kayla Gomes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/26/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Vivian Kay Stitzel (Plaintiff); As to: Kayla Gomes (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/24/2017; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1170426E9131 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E9131 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Vivian Kay Stitzel (Plaintiff); As to: Kayla Gomes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less