Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 21:34:23 (UTC).

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER VS A & M ON THIRD LLC

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A M ON THIRD LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7268

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Defendant

A & M ON THIRD LLC DBA THE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GARY S. SHERMAN, APC. - GARY S SHERMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GARY S. SHERMAN, APC.

SHERMAN GARY S

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

7/22/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/18/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

9/18/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal

9/18/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/18/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment

10/23/2017: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/31/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/28/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 25.00; Interest Credits: 5.88; Principal Credits: 775.67; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 04/03/2018 ; Status Date changed from 10/23/2017 to 04/03/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER) A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: (A & M ON THIRD LLC) (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 04/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER) A CORPORATION DBA (PREMIER MEAT COMPANY) against Defendant (A & M ON THIRD LLC) DBA (THE DISTRICT) on the Complaint filed by WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER on 04/24/2017 for the principal amount of $151.51, attorney fees of $356.05, and costs of $270.00 for a total of $777.56.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to (A & M ON THIRD LLC); On the Complaint filed by WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER on 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER) A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (A & M ON THIRD LLC) DBA (THE DISTRICT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 04/08/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA511599024. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A & M ON THIRD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERMAN GARY STEVEN