Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 22:21:57 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS BALTAZAR, JUDITH

Case Summary

On 04/14/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BALTAZAR, JUDITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7415

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

BALTAZAR JUDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAR RANJEET K.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/10/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

11/6/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER OF INTEREST

11/6/2017: Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER OF INTEREST

Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES

11/6/2017: Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES

Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER IN EXCESS OF 10%

11/6/2017: Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER IN EXCESS OF 10%

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/6/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/6/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment

12/20/2017: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/29/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

4/13/2018: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) against Defendant (BALTAZAR, JUDITH) AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) on 04/14/2017 for the principal amount of $2,580.39 and costs of $294.00 for a total of $2,874.39.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration WAIVER OF INTEREST; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration WAIVER IN EXCESS OF 10%; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: JUDITH BALTAZAR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to JUDITH BALTAZAR; On the Complaint filed by (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) on 04/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketSUPPORT OF APPLICATION; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: JUDITH BALTAZAR (Defendant); Service Date: 05/02/2017; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/30/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853144. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAR RANJEET KAUR