This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 21:29:19 (UTC).

ROLAND OLIVO VS DAVID R. GONGORA

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 ROLAND OLIVO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVID R GONGORA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3228

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVO ROLAND

Eastvale, CA 91752

Defendant

GONGORA DAVID R. DBA GONGORA'S BODY & PAINT

Pomona, CA 91768

 

Court Documents

Unknown

8/25/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/13/2017: Unknown

[Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

8/16/2017: [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

Request to Pay Judgment to Court

7/13/2017: Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by David Gongora

6/15/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by David Gongora

Minute Order of 06/15/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/15/2017: Minute Order of 06/15/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/16/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/15/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/28/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/20/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/20/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Roland Olivo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/16/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/15/2017 to 08/16/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims); Issued and Filed by: As to: Roland Olivo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: David R. Gongora (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Pay Jdgmt to Court Fee-Pmt of jdgmt to ct-CCP 116.860; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0015037 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Trust Deposit: Civil Trust Account; Amount: $574.43 Receipt: AH-2017-0015037 (Credit Card); Party: David R. Gongora (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/15/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by David Gongora; Filed by: David R. Gongora (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/15/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Roland Olivo (Plaintiff); As to: David R. Gongora (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/25/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Roland Olivo (Plaintiff); As to: David R. Gongora (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Roland Olivo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0011759 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less