This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 19:19:31 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS LIANGCO, MANDRICK

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIANGCO, MANDRICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6750

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

LIANGCO MANDRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK JORDAN D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

4/5/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

Summons

4/5/2017: Summons

Complaint

4/5/2017: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/14/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Answer

4/25/2017: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Denied

4/26/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Denied

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

4/26/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Trial - Non-Jury

5/11/2017: Notice of Trial - Non-Jury

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/12/2017: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

10/12/2017: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/12/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice (name extension) - of Non-Appearance Pursuant to C.R.C. 3.1304(c)

10/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - of Non-Appearance Pursuant to C.R.C. 3.1304(c)

Declaration (name extension) - of Custodian of Records in Support of Motion for Judgment

10/12/2017: Declaration (name extension) - of Custodian of Records in Support of Motion for Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

12/5/2017: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Judgment

12/5/2017: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/5/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)

12/5/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 12/05/2017; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) against Defendant (LIANGCO, MANDRICK) on the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 04/05/2017 for the principal amount of $1,857.59 and costs of $301.00 for a total of $2,158.59.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Result: Entered; Result Date: 12/05/2017; Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LIANGCO, MANDRICK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (LIANGCO, MANDRICK) . RECEIPT # F/W PENDING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/20/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853062. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less