This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 19:18:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS MAXWELL, NATASHA

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAXWELL, NATASHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6742

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

MAXWELL NATASHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE EMILY

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

4/5/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

Summons - Summons

4/5/2017: Summons - Summons

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/5/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/5/2017: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/16/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/2/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.60 (A)

4/2/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.60 (A)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/2/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: 1) COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033 (B) (2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

4/2/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: 1) COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033 (B) (2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/22/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 37, col 39] with Document:70923160

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) against Defendant (MAXWELL, NATASHA) on the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 04/05/2017 for the principal amount of $4,604.06 and costs of $241.00 for a total of $4,845.06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: NATASHA MAXWELL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 8, col 47] with Document:70923160

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: NATASHA MAXWELL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration RE: 1) COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033 (B) (2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.60 (A); Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to NATASHA MAXWELL; On the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 04/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 04/05/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC), does 1-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MAXWELL, NATASHA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853054. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/20/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Pierce