This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 00:47:35 (UTC).

TONYA THONG, ET AL. VS MICHAEL ALTAMIRANO

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 TONYA THONG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL ALTAMIRANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2722

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THONG VAN TAM

Rosemead, CA 91770

THONG TONYA

Rosemead, CA 91770

Defendants

ALTAMIRANO MICHAEL

Alhambra, CA 91801

PETCHARALADAKUN NANTINEE

Rosemead, CA 91770

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/8/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/7/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/7/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 07/19/2017

7/19/2017: Minute Order of 07/19/2017

Minute Order of 05/30/2017

5/30/2017: Minute Order of 05/30/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/30/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Other - (name extension) - Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration POS - Wei Liang - $51.00

5/8/2017: Other - (name extension) - Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration POS - Wei Liang - $51.00

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/8/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/8/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 09/07/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff TONYA THONG and Plaintiff VAN TAM THONG against Defendant MICHAEL ALTAMIRANO and Defendant nantinee petcharaladakun on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by TONYA THONG, et al. on 04/03/2017 for the principal amount of $9,313.00 and costs of $151.00 for a total of $9,464.00, joint and several.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: Each Defendant is responsible, severally, for 50% of the damages awarded in this case. The evidence established that Defendant Petcharladakun first rear ended Plaintiff, pushing her car into the car ahead of her, and thereafter, Defendant Altimarano rear ended Defendant Petcharladakun pushing her for a second time into Plaintiff's vehicle. Plaintiff Tonya Thong is awarded...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Updated -- Other - Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration POS - Wei Liang - $51.00: Name Extension changed from Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration - Wei Liang to Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration POS - Wei Liang - $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: TONYA THONG (Plaintiff); VAN TAM THONG (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL ALTAMIRANO (Defendant); Service Cost: 51.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: TONYA THONG (Plaintiff); VAN TAM THONG (Plaintiff); As to: nantinee petcharaladakun (Defendant); Service Cost: 25.50; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Other - Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration - Wei Liang; Filed by: TONYA THONG (Plaintiff); VAN TAM THONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: TONYA THONG (Plaintiff); VAN TAM THONG (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL ALTAMIRANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0011074 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less