This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 22:39:32 (UTC).

ANNA LADIPO VS WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 ANNA LADIPO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3481

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LADIPO ANNA

Long Beach, CA 90805

Defendant

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC DBA LOAN MART

15400 Sherman Way, Ste 170

Van Nuys, CA 91460

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/19/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

9/19/2017: Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017

9/19/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/4/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/4/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/11/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/11/2017

7/11/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/11/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/11/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/7/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

6/7/2017: Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 09/19/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Other - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed by: Anna Ladipo (Plaintiff); Wheels Financial Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation to 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • Address for Wheels Financial Group LLC (Defendant) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Anna Ladipo (Plaintiff); As to: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Anna Ladipo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0012833 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less