This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 10:28:17 (UTC).

DAIMLER TRUST VS SMITH, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 DAIMLER TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SMITH, THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4834

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAIMLER TRUST

Defendants

SMITH THOMAS

SMITH LORITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NELSON & KENNARD - ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

7/29/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/29/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/29/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

8/29/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - INTEREST

8/29/2017: Declaration (name extension) - INTEREST

Judgment

9/26/2017: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

4/23/2018: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/25/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (DAIMLER TRUST) (Plaintiff); As to: THOMAS SMITH (Defendant); LORITA SMITH (Defendant); Interest: 922.14; Service Date: 04/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 03/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (DAIMLER TRUST) against Defendant (SMITH, THOMAS) and Defendant (SMITH, LORITA) on the Complaint filed by DAIMLER TRUST on 03/22/2017 for the principal amount of $19,763.69, attorney fees of $982.00, interest of $2,643.84, and costs of $514.00 for a total of $23,903.53.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration INTEREST; Filed by: (DAIMLER TRUST) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DAIMLER TRUST on 03/22/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (DAIMLER TRUST) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO THOMAS SMITH SUB SERVED ON 040117 MAILED ON 040517 DEC DIL ATTACHED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (DAIMLER TRUST) (Plaintiff); As to: THOMAS SMITH (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/05/17; Service Cost: 72.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SMITH, LORITA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/06/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853148. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less