This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 09:45:31 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS CARINO, MARIA L

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARINO, MARIA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4675

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A

Defendant

CARINO MARIA L AKA CARINO MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, APC - NICHOLAS W. LYNES

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP, APC

LYNES NICHOLAS W.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - MEMORANDUM OF CASE

3/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - MEMORANDUM OF CASE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/2/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/2/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/2/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

3/2/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Declaration (name extension) - LOST ORIGINAL

3/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - LOST ORIGINAL

Declaration (name extension) - SUPPORT OF APPLICATION

3/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - SUPPORT OF APPLICATION

Judgment

4/23/2018: Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/14/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3/1/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (ORANGE): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (ORANGE); Issued by: Clerk; County: ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketAbstract - Request; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK N A) (Plaintiff); Interest: 22.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK N A) against Defendant (CARINO, MARIA L) AKA (CARINO, MARIA) on the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC on 03/17/2017 for the principal amount of $4,619.39 and costs of $285.00 for a total of $4,904.39.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketJUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK N A) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration SUPPORT OF APPLICATION; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK N A) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration MEMORANDUM OF CASE; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK N A) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketORDER DENYING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES OF (CARINO, MARIA L) AKA (CARINO, MARIA) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT HAS TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE NOTICE OF DENIAL OF WAIVER TO POST THE PROPER FEES WITH THE CLERK`S OFFICE. A REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER HAS BEEN MAILED TO THE APPLICANT. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketREQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (CARINO, MARIA L) AKA (CARINO, MARIA) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT F43 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (CARINO, MARIA L) AKA (CARINO, MARIA) , ANSWERING AS MARIA L CARINO . RECEIPT # F/W PENDING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (CARINO, MARIA L) AKA (CARINO, MARIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO MARIA L. CARINO SUB SERVED ON 041817 MAILED ON 042017 DEC DIL ATTACHED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/02/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853026. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less